U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00109
  • Case Name: BNSF Railway Company v Rod
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Transfer - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.