U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zamora
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Vacate]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order for Warrant ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Indictment - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Unseal Indictment - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.