U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Keefe v. State of Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2021: [Vacate]
  • November 12, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.