U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAVERES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Revoke]
  • August 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • January 05, 2022: [Appear]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.