U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.