U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Walmart, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear]
  • December 09, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.