U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Brown v. Sun Canyon Outfitters
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 03, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 28, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.