U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00004-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Cota et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [In Camera Document(s) - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.