U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguirre et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 20, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Leave to File Document ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.