U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:11-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.