U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Associated Industries Insurance Company v. K.T. Home Inspections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 10, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 02, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 28, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.