U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Foster v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.