U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-po-05043-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Boody
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.