U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Dismiss ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Vacate]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 06, 2022: [Letter - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 06, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Suppress ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.