U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Big Bow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • February 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Revoke]
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.