U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deaner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 29, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.