U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.