U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 04, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 10, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.