U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roll et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.