U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dayrider
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Vacate]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.