U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Azure v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 19, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • June 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Appear]
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 07, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2022: [Crossclaim]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Vacate]
  • February 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 11, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 10, 2022: [Crossclaim]
  • February 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.