U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Moravec v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Administrative Record]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.