U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Escene et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 10, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.