U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hines
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Time Scheduling Order - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.