U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cleland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.