U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Hurt v. Mountain View Pizza Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.