U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Coll v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • January 20, 2023: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.