U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Duff v. Principal Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • March 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.