U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanofsky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.