U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Schweyen v. University of Montana-Missoula
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • April 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Compel]
  • January 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.