U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Sinclair et al v. Driftwood et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.