U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.