U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Calflooking
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.