U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-po-05066-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Vanostrand
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Close Case Administratively]
  • November 04, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MTD]
  • September 02, 2022: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Minutes - Initial Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Issue of Summons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add Disposition Text]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.