U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-po-05065-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Thompson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Minutes - Bench Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Minute Entry - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.