U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-po-05052-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Frost
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Close Case Administratively]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.