U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-po-05050-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Christy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.