U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:08-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fevold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • July 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.