U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Rickman et al. v. Osterman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.