U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Wolves of the Rockies, Inc. v. Stone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 16, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 16, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 16, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.