U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Polejewski v. Cascade County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Stay]
  • August 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2022: [Remark]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Clarify - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.