U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00088
  • Case Name: The City of Helena v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 16, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 03, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 17, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.