U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Newman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.