U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Stokoe v. Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.