U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rider
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • November 19, 2021: [Revoke]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.