U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roehl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.