U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lynn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 03, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.