U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.