U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.