U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.